Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019