House
|
04/30/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2019
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|