House | 05/19/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2019 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 02/07/2019 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 01/03/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/03/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |