House
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#1519
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Failed to pass to 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 11-S. Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#1518
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amended 10-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amended 9-Capriglione
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#1517
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Ramos
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 7-Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#1516
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Middleton
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn 6-Lucio
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn 5-Wray
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn 4-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment to amendment offered 4-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#1515
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment amended 3-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Record vote RV#1514
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment amended 2-Ashby
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Middleton
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2); Article I, Section 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|