Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB297 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/04/2019

                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 297
 (In the Senate - Filed January 4, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 4, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; April 4, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of fines for traffic violations
 collected by certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 542.402(g), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (g)  This subsection and Subsection (f) expire on September
 1, 2031 [2021].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *