Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB306 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2019
Bill March 21, 2019