Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019