Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill April 10, 2019