Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB370 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 370
 (In the Senate - Filed January 16, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employment protections for jury service.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 122.001, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 122.001.  PROTECTION OF JURORS' EMPLOYMENT; JUROR'S
 RIGHT TO REEMPLOYMENT; NOTICE OF INTENT TO RETURN. (a)  An [A
 private] employer may not discharge, threaten to discharge,
 intimidate, or coerce any [terminate the employment of a] permanent
 employee because the employee serves as a juror, or for the
 employee's attendance or scheduled attendance in connection with
 the service, in any court in the United States.
 (b)  An employee who is discharged, threatened with
 discharge, intimidated, or coerced [whose employment is
 terminated] in violation of this section is entitled to return to
 the same employment that the employee held when summoned for jury
 service if the employee, as soon as practical after release from
 jury service, gives the employer actual notice that the employee
 intends to return.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *