Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB40 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2019
Bill March 11, 2019