Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB405 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 405
 (In the Senate - Filed January 22, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 23, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criminal offense of making a false report to a peace
 officer, federal special investigator, law enforcement employee,
 corrections officer, or jailer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 37.08, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.08.  FALSE REPORT TO PEACE OFFICER, FEDERAL SPECIAL
 INVESTIGATOR, [OR] LAW ENFORCEMENT EMPLOYEE, CORRECTIONS OFFICER,
 OR JAILER.
 SECTION 2.  Section 37.08(a), Penal Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if, with intent to deceive,
 he knowingly makes a false statement that is material to a criminal
 investigation and makes the statement to:
 (1)  a peace officer or federal special investigator
 conducting the investigation; [or]
 (2)  any employee of a law enforcement agency that is
 authorized by the agency to conduct the investigation and that the
 actor knows is conducting the investigation; or
 (3)  a corrections officer or jailer.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *