Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Motion prevails
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote RV#1608
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Amended 1-Morrison
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|