Senate | 04/09/2019 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/14/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 01/23/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |