Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB438 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/10/2019

                            By: Nelson, Rodríguez S.B. No. 438
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 10, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 10, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain time limitations on the award of
 grants by the Cancer Prevention and Research Institute of Texas
 Oversight Committee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.254, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *