Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB443 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019