House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Record vote RV#1612
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Amended 1-Y. Davis
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 3-Meyer
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 2-Wray
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Amended 1-Wray
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Postponed 5/21/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Postponed 5/20/19 7:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2019
|
Referred to Property Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|