Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB475 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/21/2019

                    S.B. No. 475


 AN ACT
 relating to an advisory body on the security of the electric grid.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.917 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.917.  TEXAS ELECTRIC GRID SECURITY COUNCIL.
 (a)  The legislature finds that there is a public interest in
 mitigating the risk of cyber and physical attacks that may affect
 the reliability of electric systems operating in Texas. The Texas
 Electric Grid Security Council is established as an advisory body
 to facilitate the creation, aggregation, coordination, and
 dissemination of best security practices for the electric industry,
 including the generation, transmission, and delivery of
 electricity.
 (b)  The Texas Electric Grid Security Council is composed of:
 (1)  the commissioner designated as presiding officer
 of the commission under Section 12.052 or a representative
 designated by the commissioner;
 (2)  the chief executive officer of the independent
 organization certified under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power
 region or a representative designated by the chief executive
 officer; and
 (3)  the governor or a representative designated by the
 governor.
 (c)  The member of the council designated by Subsection
 (b)(1) shall serve as presiding officer.
 (d)  The council shall convene at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (e)  A member of the council is not entitled to compensation.
 Members are entitled to reimbursement for travel and other
 necessary expenses related to the activities of the council as
 provided by the General Appropriations Act.
 (f)  A member of the council may apply for a secret security
 clearance or an interim security clearance granted by the United
 States government. A member of the council may not access
 classified information or participate in a briefing or meeting
 involving classified information unless the member has a secret
 security clearance.
 (g)  The independent organization certified under Section
 39.151 shall:
 (1)  provide information and resources requested by the
 council; and
 (2)  maintain nonclassified information obtained or
 created by the council, provide members of the council with access
 to the information, and retain the information for five years after
 the date that the council obtains or creates the information.
 (h)  In carrying out its functions, the council may consult
 and coordinate with:
 (1)  the Texas Division of Emergency Management;
 (2)  the United States Department of Energy;
 (3)  the United States Department of Homeland Security;
 (4)  the North American Electric Reliability
 Corporation;
 (5)  the Texas Reliability Entity;
 (6)  federal and state agencies;
 (7)  members of the electric industry; and
 (8)  grid security experts.
 (i)  On a request by the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 the chair of the house of representatives committee having
 jurisdiction over energy utility regulation, or the chair of the
 senate committee having jurisdiction over energy utility
 regulation, the council shall issue to the requestor
 recommendations regarding:
 (1)  the development of educational programs or
 marketing materials to promote the development of a grid security
 workforce;
 (2)  the development of grid security best practices;
 (3)  preparation for events that threaten grid
 security; and
 (4)  amendments to the state emergency management plan
 to ensure coordinated and adaptable response and recovery efforts
 after events that threaten grid security.
 (j)  The council may prepare a report outlining grid security
 response efforts that do not involve classified or highly
 sensitive, company-specific information. If the council prepares
 the report, the council shall deliver the report to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, and legislature on or before the December 1
 immediately preceding a regular session of the legislature.
 (k)  The meetings of the council and information obtained or
 created by the council are not subject to the requirements of
 Chapter 551 or 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 475 passed the Senate on
 April 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 475 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor