Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 3, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019