Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB493 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/22/2019

                            S.B. No. 493


 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of housing tax credits to developments
 within proximate geographical areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2306.6711, Government Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (f) and adding Subsection (f-1) to read as
 follows:
 (f)  Except as provided by Subsection (f-1), the [The] board
 may allocate housing tax credits to more than one development in a
 single community, as defined by department rule, in the same
 calendar year only if the developments are or will be located more
 than two linear miles apart. This subsection applies only to
 communities contained within counties with populations exceeding
 one million.
 (f-1)  The board may allocate housing tax credits to more
 than one development in a single community only if:
 (1)  the community is located in:
 (A)  a municipality with a population of two
 million or more; and
 (B)  an area that is a federally declared disaster
 area; and
 (2)  the governing body of the municipality containing
 the development:
 (A)  has by vote specifically authorized the
 allocation of housing tax credits for the development; and
 (B)  is authorized to administer disaster
 recovery funds as a subgrant recipient.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for low income housing tax credits that is submitted
 to the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs during an
 application cycle that is based on the 2020 qualified allocation
 plan or a subsequent plan adopted by the governing board of the
 department. An application that is submitted during an application
 cycle that is based on an earlier qualified allocation plan is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the application cycle
 began, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 493 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 493 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 107,
 Nays 26, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor