Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB494 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 28, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 9, 2019