| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2019; February 21, 2019, |
---|
| 3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & |
---|
| 4 | + | Economic Development; April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
2 | 7 | | |
---|
3 | 8 | | |
---|
4 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 11 | | relating to the notice of a hearing to adopt a proposed rule under |
---|
7 | 12 | | the Texas Clean Air Act. |
---|
8 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 382.017(b), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
10 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 16 | | (b) The commission shall provide notice of a hearing to |
---|
12 | 17 | | adopt a proposed rule under this chapter on the commission's |
---|
13 | 18 | | Internet website, and may provide notice of the hearing by other |
---|
14 | 19 | | means, including by electronic transmission or newspaper |
---|
15 | 20 | | publication. Notice of a scheduled hearing under this subsection |
---|
16 | 21 | | must: |
---|
17 | 22 | | (1) include the date, time, place, and purpose of the |
---|
18 | 23 | | hearing for the proposed rule; and |
---|
19 | 24 | | (2) be provided not later than the 20th day before the |
---|
20 | 25 | | date scheduled for the hearing. [If the rule will have statewide |
---|
21 | 26 | | effect, notice of the date, time, place, and purpose of the hearing |
---|
22 | 27 | | shall be published one time at least 20 days before the scheduled |
---|
23 | 28 | | date of the hearing in at least three newspapers, the combined |
---|
24 | 29 | | circulation of which will, in the commission's judgment, give |
---|
25 | 30 | | reasonable circulation throughout the state. If the rule will have |
---|
26 | 31 | | effect in only a part of the state, the notice shall be published |
---|
27 | 32 | | one time at least 20 days before the scheduled date of the hearing |
---|
28 | 33 | | in a newspaper of general circulation in the area to be affected.] |
---|
29 | 34 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
30 | 35 | | to a hearing to adopt a proposed rule that is scheduled by the Texas |
---|
31 | 36 | | Commission on Environmental Quality to occur on or after September |
---|
32 | 37 | | 21, 2019. A hearing to adopt a proposed rule that is scheduled by |
---|
33 | 38 | | the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality to occur before |
---|
34 | 39 | | September 21, 2019, is governed by the law in effect at the time the |
---|
35 | 40 | | hearing was scheduled to occur, and the former law is continued in |
---|
36 | 41 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
37 | 42 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|