Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 25, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2019
Bill March 6, 2019