Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB54 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 54
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2018; February 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 54 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study regarding the appropriate methods and standards
 to evaluate certain students participating in regional day school
 programs for the deaf.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  STUDY REGARDING METHODS AND STANDARDS TO
 EVALUATE CERTAIN STUDENTS.  (a)  The Texas Education Agency shall
 conduct a study regarding appropriate methods and standards to
 evaluate the performance, separately from the performance of other
 students attending the district or campus in which the program is
 physically located, of a student who spends at least 50 percent of
 the instructional day participating in a regional day school
 program for the deaf under Subchapter D, Chapter 30, Education
 Code, and whose parent or person standing in parental relation to
 the student does not reside in the school district providing
 program services.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas Education
 Agency shall provide a report of the study required by Subsection
 (a) of this section and any recommendations for legislative action
 to each standing committee of the legislature having primary
 jurisdiction over public education.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *