Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2018

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019