S.B. No. 54 AN ACT relating to a study regarding the appropriate methods and standards to evaluate certain students participating in regional day school programs for the deaf. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. STUDY REGARDING METHODS AND STANDARDS TO EVALUATE CERTAIN STUDENTS. (a) The Texas Education Agency shall conduct a study regarding appropriate methods and standards to evaluate the performance, separately from the performance of other students attending the district or campus in which the program is physically located, of a student who spends at least 50 percent of the instructional day participating in a regional day school program for the deaf under Subchapter D, Chapter 30, Education Code, and whose parent or person standing in parental relation to the student does not reside in the school district providing program services. (b) Not later than September 1, 2020, the Texas Education Agency shall provide a report of the study required by Subsection (a) of this section and any recommendations for legislative action to each standing committee of the legislature having primary jurisdiction over public education. (c) This section expires September 1, 2021. SECTION 2. IMPLEMENTATION. The Texas Education Agency is required to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that purpose, the Texas Education Agency may, but is not required to, implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that purpose. SECTION 3. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 54 passed the Senate on April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 54 passed the House on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 112, Nays 31, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor