Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB559 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2019

                    By: Miles S.B. No. 559
 (In the Senate - Filed January 31, 2019; February 21, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 14, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 559 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to patient records regarding maternal death.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 34.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  Not later than the 30th business day after receiving a
 request from the department for records regarding a
 pregnancy-related death for a specific patient, a hospital,
 birthing center, or other custodian of the records shall submit the
 records to the department. A request made under this subsection to
 a hospital or birthing center must be limited to a patient's medical
 records.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *