Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2019
Bill March 18, 2019