Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB583 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 583
1+By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 583
2+ (Rose)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the appointment of a local public defender's office to
68 represent indigent defendants in criminal cases.
79 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
810 SECTION 1. Article 26.04, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
911 amended by amending Subsections (a) and (f) to read as follows:
1012 (a) The judges of the county courts, statutory county
1113 courts, and district courts trying criminal cases in each county,
1214 by local rule, shall adopt and publish written countywide
1315 procedures for timely and fairly appointing counsel for an indigent
1416 defendant in the county arrested for, charged with, or taking an
1517 appeal from a conviction of a misdemeanor punishable by confinement
1618 or a felony. The procedures must be consistent with this article
1719 and Articles 1.051, 15.17, 15.18, 26.05, and 26.052 and must
1820 provide for the priority appointment of a public defender's office
1921 as described by Subsection (f). A court shall appoint an attorney
2022 from a public appointment list using a system of rotation, unless
2123 the court appoints an attorney under Subsection (f), (f-1), (h), or
2224 (i). The court shall appoint attorneys from among the next five
2325 names on the appointment list in the order in which the attorneys'
2426 names appear on the list, unless the court makes a finding of good
2527 cause on the record for appointing an attorney out of order. An
2628 attorney who is not appointed in the order in which the attorney's
2729 name appears on the list shall remain next in order on the list.
2830 (f) In a county with [in which] a public defender's office
2931 [is created or designated under Article 26.044], the court or the
3032 courts' designee shall give priority in appointing that office to
3133 represent the defendant in the criminal proceeding, including a
3234 proceeding in a capital murder case. However, the court is not
3335 required to appoint the public defender's office if:
34- (1) the court makes a finding of good cause for
35- appointing [has reason to appoint] other counsel, provided that in
36- a capital murder case, the court makes a finding of good cause on
37- the record for appointing that counsel; [or]
36+ (1) the court makes a finding of good cause on the
37+ record for appointing [has reason to appoint] other counsel; [or]
3838 (2) the appointment would be contrary to the office's
3939 written plan under Article 26.044;
4040 (3) the office is prohibited from accepting the
4141 appointment under Article 26.044(j); or
4242 (4) a managed assigned counsel program also exists in
4343 the county and an attorney will be appointed under that program.
4444 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
45- ______________________________ ______________________________
46- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
47- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 583 passed the Senate on
48- April 29, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 4;
49- May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
50- requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House
51- granted request of the Senate; May 25, 2019, Senate adopted
52- Conference Committee Report by the following vote: Yeas 29,
53- Nays 1.
54- ______________________________
55- Secretary of the Senate
56- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 583 passed the House, with
57- amendment, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 124,
58- Nays 17, two present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted
59- request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
60- May 25, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
61- following vote: Yeas 118, Nays 17, one present not voting.
62- ______________________________
63- Chief Clerk of the House
64- Approved:
65- ______________________________
66- Date
67- ______________________________
68- Governor