Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB606 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2019

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019