House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#2032
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Motion to reconsider fails
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote RV#1969
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
House refuses to adopt conference comm. rept.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2019
|
Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2019
|
Corrected Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Record vote RV#1388
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Record vote RV#1376
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amended 2-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Record vote RV#1375
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Motion to table fails 2-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amended 1-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Motion to table fails 1-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2019
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2019
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|