Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB632 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2019

                            S.B. No. 632


 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the governing bodies and the
 consultation policies of local mental health authorities with
 respect to sheriffs, their representatives, and local law
 enforcement agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 533, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 533.0351 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.0351.  REQUIRED COMPOSITION OF LOCAL MENTAL HEALTH
 AUTHORITY GOVERNING BODY. (a)  If a local mental health authority
 has a governing body, the governing body must include:
 (1)  for a local authority that serves only one county,
 the sheriff of the county as an ex officio nonvoting member; and
 (2)  for a local authority that serves two or more
 counties, two sheriffs chosen in accordance with Subsection (b) as
 ex officio nonvoting members.
 (b)  A local mental health authority that serves two or more
 counties shall take the median population size of each of those
 counties and choose:
 (1)  one sheriff of a county with a population above the
 median population size to serve as an ex officio nonvoting member
 under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  one sheriff of a county with a population below the
 median population size to serve as an ex officio nonvoting member
 under Subsection (a).
 (c)  A sheriff may designate a representative to serve in the
 sheriff's place as an ex officio nonvoting member under Subsection
 (a). Except as provided by Subsection (c-1), a sheriff or
 representative of the sheriff serves as an ex officio nonvoting
 member under Subsection (a) for the duration of the applicable
 sheriff's term in office.
 (c-1)  A local mental health authority may rotate the
 positions of ex officio nonvoting members as chosen in accordance
 with Subsection (b) among the other sheriffs of the counties served
 by the local authority. A local authority shall consult with each
 sheriff of the counties served by the local authority in rotating
 the positions of ex officio nonvoting members under this
 subsection.
 (d)  A local mental health authority may not bar or restrict
 a sheriff or representative of a sheriff who serves as an ex officio
 nonvoting member under Subsection (a) from speaking or providing
 input at a meeting of the local authority's governing body.
 (e)  If a local mental health authority does not have a
 governing body, the local authority shall:
 (1)  for a local authority that serves only one county,
 consult with the sheriff of the county or a representative of the
 sheriff regarding the use of funds received under Section
 533.035(b); or
 (2)  for a local authority that serves two or more
 counties, take the median population size of each of those counties
 and consult with both:
 (A)  a sheriff or a representative of a sheriff of
 a county with a population above the median population size
 regarding the use of funds received under Section 533.035(b); and
 (B)  a sheriff or a representative of a sheriff of
 a county with a population below the median population size
 regarding the use of funds received under Section 533.035(b).
 (f)  This section does not prevent a sheriff or
 representative of a sheriff from being included in the governing
 body of a local mental health authority as a voting member of the
 body.
 SECTION 2.  Section 533.0352(d), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  In developing the local service area plan, the local
 mental health authority shall:
 (1)  solicit information regarding community needs
 from:
 (A)  representatives of the local community;
 (B)  consumers of community-based mental health
 services and members of the families of those consumers; [and]
 (C)  local law enforcement agencies; and
 (D)  other interested persons; and
 (2)  consider:
 (A)  criteria for assuring accountability for,
 cost-effectiveness of, and relative value of service delivery
 options;
 (B)  goals to minimize the need for state hospital
 and community hospital care;
 (C)  goals to divert consumers of services from
 the criminal justice system;
 (D)  goals to ensure that a child with mental
 illness remains with the child's parent or guardian as appropriate
 to the child's care; and
 (E)  opportunities for innovation in services and
 service delivery.
 SECTION 3.  Section 534.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 534.002.  BOARD OF TRUSTEES FOR CENTER ESTABLISHED BY
 ONE LOCAL AGENCY.  (a)  The board of trustees of a community center
 established by one local agency is composed of:
 (1)  the members of the local agency's governing body;
 [or]
 (2)  not fewer than five or more than nine qualified
 voters who reside in the region to be served by the center and who
 are appointed by the local agency's governing body; and
 (3)  a sheriff or a representative of a sheriff of a
 county in the region served by the community center who is appointed
 by the local agency's governing body to serve as an ex officio
 nonvoting member.
 (b)  If a qualified voter appointed to a community center
 under Subsection (a)(2) is the sheriff of the only county in the
 region served by a community center, Subsection (a)(3) does not
 apply.
 (c)  If a qualified voter appointed to a community center
 under Subsection (a)(2) is a sheriff of a county in the region
 served by a community center and the region served by the community
 center consists of more than one county, under Subsection (a)(3)
 the local agency's governing body shall appoint a sheriff or a
 representative of a sheriff from a different county in the region
 served by the community center.
 (d)  Subsection (a)(3) does not prevent a sheriff or
 representative of a sheriff from being included on the board of
 trustees of a community center as a voting member of the board.
 SECTION 4.  Section 534.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and
 (a-2) to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (a-1), the [The] board
 of trustees of a community center established by an organizational
 combination of local agencies is composed of not fewer than five or
 more than 13 members.
 (a-1)  In addition to the members described by Subsection
 (a), the board of trustees of a community center must include:
 (1)  if the region served by the community center
 consists of only one county, the sheriff of that county or a
 representative of the sheriff to serve as an ex officio nonvoting
 member; or
 (2)  if the region served by the community center
 consists of more than one county, sheriffs from at least two of the
 counties in the region served by the community center or
 representatives of the sheriffs to serve as ex officio nonvoting
 members.
 (a-2)  Subsection (a-1) does not prevent a sheriff or
 representative of a sheriff from being included on the board of
 trustees of a community center as a voting member of the board.
 SECTION 5.  If the governing body of a local mental health
 authority established under Chapter 533, Health and Safety Code, or
 the board of trustees of a community center established under
 Chapter 534, Health and Safety Code, includes a sheriff or
 representative of a sheriff as a voting member of the governing body
 or board of trustees before the effective date of this Act, the
 sheriff or representative of the sheriff may continue to serve as a
 voting member of the governing body or board of trustees after the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 632 passed the Senate on
 March 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 632 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor