Senate | 05/17/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/17/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |