Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB683 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/21/2019

                            S.B. No. 683


 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of pharmacists and
 pharmacies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 481.075(i), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (i)  Each dispensing pharmacist shall:
 (1)  fill in on the official prescription form or note
 in the electronic prescription record each item of information
 given orally to the dispensing pharmacy under Subsection (h) and
 the date the prescription is filled, and:
 (A)  for a written prescription, fill in the
 dispensing pharmacist's signature; or
 (B)  for an electronic prescription,
 appropriately record the identity of the dispensing pharmacist in
 the electronic prescription record;
 (2)  retain with the records of the pharmacy for at
 least two years:
 (A)  the official prescription form or the
 electronic prescription record, as applicable; and
 (B)  the name or other patient identification
 required by Section 481.074(m) or (n); [and]
 (3)  send all required information, including any
 information required to complete an official prescription form or
 electronic prescription record, to the board by electronic transfer
 or another form approved by the board not later than the next
 business day after the date the prescription is completely filled;
 and
 (4)  if the pharmacy does not dispense any controlled
 substance prescriptions during a period of seven consecutive days,
 send a report to the board indicating that the pharmacy did not
 dispense any controlled substance prescriptions during that
 period, unless the pharmacy has obtained a waiver or permission to
 delay reporting to the board.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 481.076(a) and (k), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board may not permit any person to have access to
 information submitted to the board under Section 481.074(q) or
 481.075 except:
 (1)  the board, the Texas Medical Board, the Texas
 Department of Licensing and Regulation, with respect to the
 regulation of podiatrists [State Board of Podiatric Medical
 Examiners], the State Board of Dental Examiners, the State Board of
 Veterinary Medical Examiners, the Texas Board of Nursing, or the
 Texas Optometry Board for the purpose of:
 (A)  investigating a specific license holder; or
 (B)  monitoring for potentially harmful
 prescribing or dispensing patterns or practices under Section
 481.0762;
 (2)  an authorized officer or member of the department
 or authorized employee of the board engaged in the administration,
 investigation, or enforcement of this chapter or another law
 governing illicit drugs in this state or another state;
 (3)  the department on behalf of a law enforcement or
 prosecutorial official engaged in the administration,
 investigation, or enforcement of this chapter or another law
 governing illicit drugs in this state or another state;
 (4)  a medical examiner conducting an investigation;
 (5)  provided that accessing the information is
 authorized under the Health Insurance Portability and
 Accountability Act of 1996 (Pub. L. No. 104-191) and regulations
 adopted under that Act:
 (A)  a pharmacist or a pharmacist-intern,
 pharmacy technician, or pharmacy technician trainee, as defined by
 Section 551.003, Occupations Code, acting at the direction of a
 pharmacist, who is inquiring about a recent Schedule II, III, IV, or
 V prescription history of a particular patient of the pharmacist;
 or
 (B)  a practitioner who:
 (i)  is a physician, dentist, veterinarian,
 podiatrist, optometrist, or advanced practice nurse or is a
 physician assistant described by Section 481.002(39)(D) or an
 employee or other agent of a practitioner acting at the direction of
 a practitioner; and
 (ii)  is inquiring about a recent Schedule
 II, III, IV, or V prescription history of a particular patient of
 the practitioner;
 (6)  a pharmacist or practitioner who is inquiring
 about the person's own dispensing or prescribing activity or a
 practitioner who is inquiring about the prescribing activity of an
 individual to whom the practitioner has delegated prescribing
 authority; or
 (7)  one or more states or an association of states with
 which the board has an interoperability agreement, as provided by
 Subsection (j).
 (k)  A person authorized to access information under
 Subsection (a)(4) or (5) who is registered with the board for
 electronic access to the information is entitled to directly access
 the information available from other states pursuant to an
 interoperability agreement described by Subsection (j).
 SECTION 3.  Section 481.0766(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A wholesale distributor shall report to the board the
 distribution of all Schedules II, III, IV, and V controlled
 substances [information that the distributor is required to report
 to the Automation of Reports and Consolidated Orders System (ARCOS)
 of the Federal Drug Enforcement Administration for the distribution
 of a controlled substance] by the distributor to a person in this
 state. The distributor shall report the information to the board in
 the same format and with the same frequency as the information is
 reported to the Federal Drug Enforcement Administration [ARCOS].
 SECTION 4.  Section 481.353(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The work group shall meet when necessary as determined
 by the board [at least quarterly].
 SECTION 5.  Section 560.051(f), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  A Class E pharmacy license or nonresident pharmacy
 license may be issued to a pharmacy located in another state whose
 primary business is to:
 (1) [(A)]  dispense a prescription drug or device under
 a prescription drug order[;] and
 [(B)]  deliver the drug or device to a patient,
 including a patient in this state, by United States mail, common
 carrier, or delivery service;
 (2)  process a prescription drug order for a patient,
 including a patient in this state; or
 (3)  perform another pharmaceutical service, as
 defined by board rule.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter B, Chapter 565, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 565.0591 to read as follows:
 Sec. 565.0591.  REVOCATION OF PHARMACY LICENSE FOR FAILURE
 TO OPERATE. (a) On discovery by the board that a pharmacy licensed
 under Chapter 560 has ceased to operate for a period of 30 days or
 longer, the board shall notify the pharmacy that the license will be
 revoked.
 (b)  The notice must:
 (1)  include a statement that the pharmacy license is
 being revoked for violation of Section 565.002(a)(7); and
 (2)  inform the license holder of the license holder's
 right to a hearing to contest the revocation.
 (c)  Not later than the 20th day after the date the license
 holder receives the notice of revocation under this section, the
 license holder may submit a written request for a hearing to contest
 the revocation.
 (d)  If the license holder does not request a hearing within
 the period prescribed by Subsection (c), the board shall:
 (1)  enter an order revoking the license; and
 (2)  notify the license holder of the order.
 (e)  If the license holder requests a hearing within the
 period prescribed by Subsection (c), a panel of three board members
 appointed by the president of the board shall conduct the hearing.
 At the hearing the panel shall determine whether the license holder
 has violated Section 565.002(a)(7).
 (f)  If the panel determines that the license holder
 committed the violation, the board shall promptly:
 (1)  enter an order revoking the license; and
 (2)  notify the license holder of the order.
 (g)  Chapter 2001, Government Code, does not apply to a
 determination under Subsection (e).
 SECTION 7.  The following provisions of the Occupations Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 554.016, 556.0555, 560.001(c), 560.0525,
 561.003(f), 562.101(f-1), and 562.111; and
 (2)  Subchapter E, Chapter 562.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 683 passed the Senate on
 March 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 683 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 4, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor