Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB696 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Huffman, Paxton S.B. No. 696
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
4+ April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
5+ Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
49 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
510 AN ACT
611 relating to peace officer instruction on the trafficking of persons
712 and compelling prostitution.
813 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
914 SECTION 1. Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended
1015 by adding Subsection (p) to read as follows:
1116 (p) As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
1217 commission shall require an officer to complete the basic education
1318 and training program on the trafficking of persons developed under
1419 Section 1701.258(a). An officer shall complete the program not
1520 later than the second anniversary of the date the officer is
1621 licensed under this chapter unless the officer completes the
1722 program as part of the officer's basic training course.
1823 SECTION 2. Section 1701.258(a), Occupations Code, is
1924 amended to read as follows:
2025 (a) The commission [by rule] shall require an officer [first
2126 licensed by the commission on or after January 1, 2011,] to complete
2227 [within a reasonable time after obtaining the license] a one-time
2328 basic education and training program on the trafficking of persons.
2429 The program must:
2530 (1) consist of at least four hours of training; and
2631 (2) include a review of the substance of Sections
2732 20A.02 and 43.05, Penal Code.
2833 SECTION 3. Section 1701.402(j), Occupations Code, is
2934 amended to read as follows:
3035 (j) As a requirement for issuance of an intermediate or
3136 advanced proficiency certificate [issued by the commission on or
3237 after January 1, 2011], an officer must complete the advanced
3338 [basic] education, instruction, and training program on the
3439 trafficking of persons and compelling prostitution described by
3540 Section 1701.258(b) [1701.258(a)].
3641 SECTION 4. Section 1701.402(j), Occupations Code, as
3742 amended by this Act, applies only to an intermediate or advanced
3843 proficiency certificate issued by the Texas Commission on Law
3944 Enforcement on or after the effective date of this Act.
4045 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
46+ * * * * *