Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 20, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill March 14, 2019