Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB700 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2019
Bill March 27, 2019