Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 8, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2019
Bill April 4, 2019