Senate | 04/30/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |