Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB723 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 723
 (In the Senate - Filed February 8, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 23, 2019,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1;
 April 23, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring an independent school district to post a
 superintendent's annual compensation on its Internet website.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.201, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-3) to read as follows:
 (b-3)  A school district that maintains an Internet website
 shall post on the district's website the annual compensation
 received by the superintendent, including listing each amount paid
 by the district as:
 (1)  an annual salary;
 (2)  a bonus;
 (3)  a benefit; or
 (4)  an allowance or stipend for technology, housing,
 transportation, or another miscellaneous expense.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *