Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB732 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hughes, West S.B. No. 732
2+ (In the Senate - Filed February 8, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
4+ May 2, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent
6+ to printer.)
7+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 732 By: Creighton
28
39
410 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
511 AN ACT
612 relating to the regulation of the practice of physical therapy.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 453.301, Occupations Code, is amended to
915 read as follows:
1016 Sec. 453.301. PRACTICE BY PHYSICAL THERAPIST [TREATING
1117 PATIENT UNDER PRIOR REFERRAL]. (a) A physical therapist may treat
1218 a patient for an injury or condition in a manner described by
1319 Section 453.005 without a [that was the subject of a prior] referral
1420 if the physical therapist:
1521 (1) has been licensed to practice physical therapy for
1622 at least one year;
1723 (2) is covered by professional liability insurance in
1824 the minimum amount required by board rule [notifies the referring
1925 practitioner of the therapy not later than the fifth business day
2026 after the date therapy is begun]; and
2127 (3) either:
2228 (A) possesses a doctoral degree in physical
2329 therapy from:
2430 (i) a program that is accredited by the
2531 Commission on Accreditation in Physical Therapy Education; or
2632 (ii) an institution that is accredited by
2733 an agency or association recognized by the United States secretary
2834 of education; or
2935 (B) has completed at least 30 hours of continuing
3036 competence activities in the area of differential diagnosis.
3137 (a-1) Except as provided by Subsection (a-2), a physical
3238 therapist may treat a patient under Subsection (a) [begins any
3339 episode of treatment before the first anniversary of the referral
3440 by the referring practitioner;
3541 [(4) for physical therapy episodes subsequent to the
3642 episode which was initiated by the referral, treats the patient]
3743 for not more than 10 [20 treatment sessions or 30] consecutive
3844 business [calendar] days[, whichever occurs first; and
3945 [(5) satisfies any other requirement set by the
4046 board].
4147 (a-2) A physical therapist who possesses a doctoral degree
4248 described by Subsection (a)(3)(A) and has completed a residency or
4349 fellowship may treat a patient under Subsection (a) for not more
4450 than 15 consecutive business days.
4551 (b) The physical therapist must obtain a referral from a
4652 [confer with the] referring practitioner before the physical
4753 therapist may continue treatment that exceeds treatment authorized
4854 under Subsection (a-1) or (a-2), as applicable [(a)(4)].
4955 (c) A physical therapist who treats a patient without a
5056 referral shall obtain from the patient a signed disclosure on a form
5157 prescribed by the board in which the patient acknowledges that:
5258 (1) physical therapy is not a substitute for a medical
5359 diagnosis by a physician;
5460 (2) physical therapy is not based on radiological
5561 imaging;
5662 (3) a physical therapist cannot diagnose an illness or
5763 disease; and
5864 (4) the patient's health insurance may not include
5965 coverage for the physical therapist's services.
6066 SECTION 2. Section 453.351(a), Occupations Code, is amended
6167 to read as follows:
6268 (a) The board may deny a license or suspend or revoke a
6369 license, place a license holder on probation, reprimand a license
6470 holder, impose an administrative penalty, or otherwise discipline a
6571 license holder if the applicant or license holder has:
6672 (1) except as provided by Section [453.301 or]
6773 453.302, provided care [physical therapy] to a person outside the
6874 scope of the physical therapist's practice [without a referral from
6975 a referring practitioner];
7076 (2) used drugs or intoxicating liquors to an extent
7177 that affects the license holder's or applicant's professional
7278 competence;
7379 (3) been convicted of a felony, including a finding or
7480 verdict of guilty, an admission of guilt, or a plea of nolo
7581 contendere, in this state or in any other state or nation;
7682 (4) obtained or attempted to obtain a license by fraud
7783 or deception;
7884 (5) been grossly negligent in the practice of physical
7985 therapy or in acting as a physical therapist assistant;
8086 (6) been found to be mentally incompetent by a court;
8187 (7) practiced physical therapy in a manner detrimental
8288 to the public health and welfare;
8389 (8) had a license to practice physical therapy revoked
8490 or suspended or had other disciplinary action taken against the
8591 license holder or applicant;
8692 (9) had the license holder's or applicant's
8793 application for a license refused, revoked, or suspended by the
8894 proper licensing authority of another state or nation; or
8995 (10) in the case of a physical therapist assistant,
9096 treated a person other than under the direction of a physical
9197 therapist.
9298 SECTION 3. Not later than November 1, 2019, the Texas Board
9399 of Physical Therapy Examiners shall adopt rules necessary to
94100 implement Section 453.301, Occupations Code, as amended by this
95101 Act.
96102 SECTION 4. Section 453.301(c), Occupations Code, as added
97103 by this Act, applies only to treatment by a physical therapist that
98104 is provided on or after November 1, 2019. Treatment that is
99105 provided before November 1, 2019, is governed by the law in effect
100106 on the date the treatment was provided, and the former law is
101107 continued in effect for that purpose.
102108 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
109+ * * * * *