Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB751 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 751


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a criminal offense for fabricating a
 deceptive video with intent to influence the outcome of an
 election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 255.004, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  A person commits an offense if the person, with intent
 to injure a candidate or influence the result of an election:
 (1)  creates a deep fake video; and
 (2)  causes the deep fake video to be published or
 distributed within 30 days of an election.
 (e)  In this section, "deep fake video" means a video,
 created with the intent to deceive, that appears to depict a real
 person performing an action that did not occur in reality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 751 passed the Senate on
 April 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 751 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor