Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB752 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 11, 2019

Engrossed

Bill March 19, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2019
Bill March 13, 2019