By: Hancock S.B. No. 787 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2019; March 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 787 By: Hancock A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a reduced occupational licensing fee for certain former license holders. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 57, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Section 57.003 to read as follows: Sec. 57.003. REDUCED OCCUPATIONAL LICENSING FEE FOR CERTAIN FORMER LICENSE HOLDERS. (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a state agency that issues a license shall adopt rules requiring the agency to charge a reduced license application fee or reactivation fee, as applicable, not to exceed one-third of the amount of the usual fee, to an applicant who: (1) in the two-year period preceding the date of the application, became a parent by natural birth or adoption; and (2) immediately before the birth or adoption, held an active license of the same type for which the person is applying. (b) Rules adopted under this section may require an applicant to submit to the state agency an attestation or other documentation relating to the child's birth or adoption. SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2020, a state agency to which Section 57.003, Occupations Code, as added by this Act, applies shall adopt and implement the rules required by that section. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *