Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB790 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 12, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 4, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2019
Bill April 1, 2019