Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB820 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/26/2019

                            S.B. No. 820


 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a school district adopt a
 cybersecurity policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 11, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 11.175 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.175.  DISTRICT CYBERSECURITY. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Breach of system security" means an incident in which
 student information that is sensitive, protected, or confidential,
 as provided by state or federal law, is stolen or copied,
 transmitted, viewed, or used by a person unauthorized to engage in
 that action.
 (2)  "Cyber attack" means an attempt to damage,
 disrupt, or gain unauthorized access to a computer, computer
 network, or computer system.
 (3)  "Cybersecurity" means the measures taken to
 protect a computer, computer network, or computer system against
 unauthorized use or access.
 (b)  Each school district shall adopt a cybersecurity policy
 to:
 (1)  secure district cyberinfrastructure against cyber
 attacks and other cybersecurity incidents; and
 (2)  determine cybersecurity risk and implement
 mitigation planning.
 (c)  A school district's cybersecurity policy may not
 conflict with the information security standards for institutions
 of higher education adopted by the Department of Information
 Resources under Chapters 2054 and 2059, Government Code.
 (d)  The superintendent of each school district shall
 designate a cybersecurity coordinator to serve as a liaison between
 the district and the agency in cybersecurity matters.
 (e)  The district's cybersecurity coordinator shall report
 to the agency any cyber attack or other cybersecurity incident
 against the district cyberinfrastructure that constitutes a breach
 of system security as soon as practicable after the discovery of the
 attack or incident.
 (f)  The district's cybersecurity coordinator shall provide
 notice to a parent of or person standing in parental relation to a
 student enrolled in the district of an attack or incident for which
 a report is required under Subsection (e) involving the student's
 information.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 820 passed the Senate on
 April 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 25, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 820 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 133,
 Nays 10, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor