Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB871 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2019

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 8, 2019
Bill April 23, 2019