Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB89 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Hall, et al. S.B. No. 89
2- (Wilson)
1+By: Hall, Creighton S.B. No. 89
32
43
54 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
65 AN ACT
76 relating to a ribbon for certain members of the military forces who
87 served in support of operations to secure the Texas border.
98 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
109 SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, is amended
1110 to read as follows:
1211 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
1312 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
1413 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
1514 awarded to a service member who:
1615 (A) after September 11, 2001:
1716 (i) was inducted into federal service from
1817 the Texas National Guard; and
1918 (ii) meets the criteria for an award of the
2019 federal Purple Heart Medal; or
2120 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
2221 November 5, 2009;
2322 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2423 awarded to:
2524 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
2625 who has:
2726 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
2827 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
2928 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
3029 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3130 demanding responsibility; or
3231 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3332 service to the Texas military forces;
3433 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
3534 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
3635 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
3736 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
3837 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
3938 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
4039 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4140 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4241 achievement or service; and
4342 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4443 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
4544 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
4645 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
4746 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
4847 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
4948 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5049 be awarded to a service member who:
5150 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5251 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5352 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5453 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
5554 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
5655 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
5756 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
5857 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
5958 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6059 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6160 who served:
6261 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6362 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6463 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
6564 and
6665 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
6766 mission in the state under civilian authority;
6867 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
6968 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7069 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7170 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7271 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7372 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7473 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
7574 the United States secretary of defense;
7675 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
7776 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
7877 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
7978 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8079 this state;
8180 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8281 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8382 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8483 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
8584 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
8685 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
8786 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
8887 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
8988 great loyalty to this state;
9089 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9190 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9291 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9392 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9493 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
9594 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
9695 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
9796 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
9897 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
9998 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
10099 military duty, after:
101100 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
102101 Freedom; or
103102 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
104103 Dawn;
105104 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
106105 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
107106 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
108107 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
109108 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
110109 military duty; [and]
111110 (15) the Cold War Medal, which, subject to Subsection
112111 (c), shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this
113112 state or the United States who:
114113 (A) served between September 2, 1945, and
115114 December 26, 1991; and
116115 (B) was a resident of this state at the time the
117116 service member entered military service; and
118117 (16) the Texas Border Security and Support Service
119118 Ribbon, which shall be awarded to a member of the state military
120119 forces who served:
121120 (A) on or after July 28, 2014;
122121 (B) on state active duty for at least 30
123122 consecutive days; and
124123 (C) satisfactorily in support of operations to
125124 secure the Texas border.
126125 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.