Senate | 04/11/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |