Senate | 04/17/2019 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/11/2019 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |