House | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/27/2019 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Passed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2019 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |